Financial history FREELY GIVEN RETREATS

Charity number: 1167145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.80k £11.74k £7.68k £12.10k £20.58k
Total expenditure £21.77k £10.32k £8.50k £12.09k £20.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A