FREELY GIVEN RETREATS

Charity number: 1167145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to make Insight Meditation retreats available to everyone. Our retreats are open to all without any charges. Insight Meditation is the practice of developing mindful investigation, leading to wisdom, compassion and the ending of suffering. It is Buddhist in origin but our retreats are open to all regardless of religious affiliation. Our retreats are generally in silence.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,581
Total expenditure: £20,146

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 May 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lesley Wye Chair 09 March 2022
BRISTOL INSIGHT MEDITATION
Received: On time
STEWART MOIR Trustee 06 January 2015
None on record
RICHARD REID Trustee 01 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.80k £11.74k £7.68k £12.10k £20.58k
Total expenditure £21.77k £10.32k £8.50k £12.09k £20.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mill House
Rew Road
Ashburton
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 7EJ
Phone:
07935226061