THE E-NUTRITION ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
eNutrition Academy is a global organisation created to help teach nutrition science to nutritionists around the world free of charge, especially where people are most at risk of malnutrition such as Africa, South Asia and South America. Working in partnership with local academia, it supports undergraduates, postgraduates and those already in work seeking continuous professional development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- South Africa
Governance
- 05 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR CATHERINE ALISON GEISSLER | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GRACE SUZANNE MARQUIS | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SHARON DONOVAN | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOYCE KINABO | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR IGNATIUS AKHAKHIA ONIMAWO | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HELMUT HESEKER | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL AMUNA | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev TOM AKUETTEH NDANU | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr FRANCIS ZOTOR | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNA LARTEY | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £270 | £420 | £420 | £480 | £480 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF NUTRITIONAL SCIENCE 2. TO PROMOTE HEALTH BY THE APPLICATION OF NUTRITIONAL SCIENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mr Mark Hollingsworth
UNIT 10
CAMBRIDGE COURT
210 SHEPHERDS BUSH ROAD
LONDON
W6 7NJ
- Phone:
- 02076056565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window