Accounts and annual returns FENTON CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity Number: 1160280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 06 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 15 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 15 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window