PUN SAMAAJ UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pun Samaaj UK aims to advance and operate of all social activities under a declaration of Trust and Scheme sealed by the Charity Commissioner for England and Wales. We provide our youngsters for the opportunities, responsibilities and experiences of later life. Bringing of all elderly and young people at one place and start interaction in various topics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tara Bahadur Pun | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pun Samaaj UK | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
UMESHKUMAR PUN MVO | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
KRISHNA BAHADUR PUN | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TAK PRASAD PUN | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEUMAN PUN | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DHAN BAHADUR PUN | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/06/2020 | 10/06/2021 | 10/06/2022 | 10/06/2023 | 10/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | £24.42k | £24.20k | £39.19k | £15.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.00k | £24.15k | £11.05k | £38.55k | £12.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 June 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Mar 2015 as amended on 28 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN (IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE NEPALESE COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: - PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THE NEPALESE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR THE PUN CLAN AND ASSISTING NEW ARRIVALS TO THE UK WITH INTEGRATION INTO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THROUGH THE FACILITATION OF COMMUNITY EVENTS; - PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR ALL AGE GROUPS TO ASSIST IN INTEGRATING WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; - PROVIDING ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND REPRESENTATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Mario Way
COLCHESTER
CO2 7QN
- Phone:
- 07850920560
- Email:
- punsamaajuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window