BROCKHAMPTON CRICKET CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the amateur sport of cricket. To advance education (including social and physical training) including providing cricket coaching. To promote community participation in healthy recreation, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of facilities for the learning, teaching and playing of cricket, and to promote the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 11 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROYSTON JOHN WARGEN | Chair | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Watkins | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Phillips | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniele Manacchini | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE BARBARA CAWLEY SMITH | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GUY HENRY SHAW BEST | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.37k | £36.86k | £93.35k | £61.14k | £54.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.25k | £22.59k | £50.92k | £65.11k | £54.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 12 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 12 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROCKHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: (1) TO PROMOTE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF CRICKET; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING CRICKET COACHING; (3) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF CRICKET; AND (4) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SADDLERS COTTAGES
MORDIFORD
HEREFORD
HR1 4LP
- Phone:
- 01432870341
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window