Financial history SALTBURN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1160067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.55k £777 £2.92k £2.21k £4.70k
Total expenditure £4.63k £813 £792 £1.66k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A