NEWPORT MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities where men can meet to undertake creative, physical or recreational activities, learn or pass on skills and knowledge, and support each other socially to prevent and alleviate loneliness and isolation and avoid social exclusion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 05 March 2015: CIO registration
- TELFORD MEN'S SHED (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM GORMLEY | Chair | 06 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Leslie David Swinton | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean McKeown | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roy Griffiths | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin A Beal | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Taylor | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE JOHN KENNY BA, PGCE | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | £3.81k | £7.78k | £7.94k | £8.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £3.65k | £4.85k | £5.87k | £5.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Buckland Walk
Newport
TF10 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01952525289
- Email:
- info@telfordmensshed.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window