Trustees NEWPORT MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1160771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM GORMLEY Chair 06 January 2015
TELFORD REPAIR CAFE
Received: On time
Leslie David Swinton Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Sean McKeown Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Roy Griffiths Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Kevin A Beal Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Martin Taylor Trustee 14 December 2018
None on record
TERENCE JOHN KENNY BA, PGCE Trustee 06 January 2015
None on record