Financial history NORTH DEVON DANCE FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 1164230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.80k £0 £0 £11.18k £8.91k
Total expenditure £7.61k £0 £376 £9.00k £9.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A