THINKING OF OSCAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support & activities for patients (children), their families & medical teams who strive to make their time in hospital as comfortable as possible Providing funding for development of research & development into, & provision of improved diagnostic techniques & technology. Providing increased access to relevant knowledge & data, via sharing of best practice & application of technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 February 2015: CIO registration
- TOO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH COLE | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Stephen Brett | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Burt | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Bufford | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COLE | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.38k | £3.59k | £8.40k | £8.40k | £2.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.35k | £3.60k | £25.22k | £25.22k | £49.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHILST IN HOSPITAL CARE ACROSS ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES TO PATIENTS (CHILDREN) THEIR FAMILIES AND MEDICAL TEAMS WHO STRIVE TO MAKE THEIR TIME IN HOSPITAL AS COMFORTABLE AS POSSIBLE. (2) PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO AND THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED DIAGNOSTIC TECHNIQUES AND TECHNOLOGY. (3) PROVIDING INCREASED ACCESS TO RELEVANT KNOWLEDGE AND DATA VIA THE SHARING OF BEST PRACTICE AND THE APPLICATION OF TECHNOLOGY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn House
Park Farm
Akeman Street
Kirtlington
KIDLINGTON
Oxfordsh
- Phone:
- 01865694136
- Email:
- charity@thinkingofoscar.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window