CASTLEFORD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church aims to be a loving, welcoming and safe environment for all, providing religious services at least once a week whereby hymns, prayers and religious philosophy will be conducted. Spiritual healing will be available as will mediumship demonstrations, tutorial classes, help and advice on matters relative to spiritualism. Spiritualist wedding, funeral and naming services are also available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE MARY SIDWELL | Chair | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Roebuck | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Teresa Finister | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNY HANSON | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Margaret Barker | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Battye | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Anthony Gregg | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS IVOR HARRISON | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET NEWSOME | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Taylor | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Newsome | Trustee | 12 March 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.54k | £5.67k | £15.04k | £16.08k | £19.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.28k | £6.93k | £7.16k | £13.89k | £11.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Manor Park Avenue
Allerton Bywater
Castleford
WF10 2DW
- Phone:
- 01977557881
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window