Financial history LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL NEWBURY

Charity number: 1161426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.79k £158.02k £95.90k £118.45k £140.45k
Total expenditure £197.57k £145.72k £107.13k £120.97k £118.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £117.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £137.43k £14.94k £69.90k £80.25k N/A