INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR COLLABORATIVE CREATIVITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IFCC is a London/New York web based non-profit start-up whose aim is to unite 28 leading visionary visual and sound artists, writers and performers annually from 28 different countries to collaborate on creating new narratives of possibility inspiring geopolitical change via the medium of cinema and the new art form of Virtual Reality cinema.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 January 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 26 June 2015: CIO registration
- IFCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GABRIELLE COLLET | Chair | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Armands Bels | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/01/2017 | 05/01/2018 | 05/01/2019 | 05/01/2020 | 05/01/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.SUPPORTING THE WORK OF AN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; 2.FUNDING RESEARCH AT ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH PROMOTE THE SUBJECTS OF INTERNATIONAL COLLABORATIVE CREATIVITY; 3.SUPPORTING, FUNDING AND PROVIDING PROVISIONS FOR A LIBRARY AT THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF COLLABORATIVE CREATIVITY; 4.SUPPORTING AND PROVIDING PROVISIONS FOR AN ART/GALLERY/MUSEUM AT THE FACILITY OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF COLLABORATIVE CREATIVITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Hillfield Park
LONDON
Flat B
N10 3QT
- Phone:
- 07367551131
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window