Financial history EGGBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 505662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £19.42k £22.24k £13.31k £15.15k £18.18k
Total expenditure £10.13k £21.60k £13.46k £9.53k £16.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.09k N/A £976 £3.20k