Trustees COMMUNITY HALLS IN PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1163728

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGUS KERR | Chair | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lee | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Merz | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Morrissey | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Scordis | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANITA GREGORY | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.