NEW UNITY

Charity Number: 1161363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

New Unity is committed to being a radically inclusive, open-minded, spiritual community that balances three essential elements: Personal spiritual growth, a supportive and loving community and working for justice in the larger world. Members and friends envision a radically inclusive congregation that changes the world around it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £275,031
Total expenditure: £391,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 2015: CIO registration
  • 25 October 2016: Funds received from 252991 TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH UNITY CHURCH, I...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Susan Morrison Chair 18 July 2021
None on record
Mary Helen Wright Trustee 05 January 2025
None on record
Themistoklis Tefas Trustee 05 January 2025
None on record
Lisa Roskam Trustee 13 November 2023
None on record
Vicky Ryder Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.52m £409.48k £277.86k £288.90k £275.03k
Total expenditure £1.55m £338.39k £350.97k £369.59k £391.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.90k N/A N/A £3.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.40m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £95.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £4.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £17.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £140 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £7.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
New Unity
277A Upper Street
LONDON
N1 2TZ
Phone:
020 7354 0774