ERITREAN SAHO COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives Disability The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty Accommodation/housing Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity Recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- ESCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2024 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2024 | 252 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 October 2024 | 616 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2024 | 617 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO ARE: 1.TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE FROM THE SAHO COMMUNITY LIVING IN LAMBETH BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP IN CENTRE TO PROVIDE TRAINING FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM WITH THE ADAPTION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 2.TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 LIVING IN LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF WOMEN WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HARASSMENT INCLUDING SEXUAL AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE (SGBV), FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, FORCED MARRIAGES OR SUCH OTHER ABUSE WHERE THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS HAVE BEEN VIOLATED AND THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING HAS BEEN ADVERSELY AFFECTED. 4.TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN OUR COMMUNITY WHO RESIDE IN LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS FROM SOCIAL ISOLATION DUE TO POOR HEALTH EMOTIONALLY OR PHYSICALLY, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH SAFE SPACE AND ENGAGING THEM IN SOCIAL ACTIVITIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window