OPENEYES FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1163718
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. To advance & protect health for the public benefit, to relieve sickness and suffering by overseeing the sustained development and accessibility of open source software for managing patient records; 2. To advance education & research particularly, but not exclusively, in relation to and facilitated by open source software in health and care settings by charitable means for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018

Total income: £15,000
Total expenditure: £25,304

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Afghanistan
  • Akrotiri
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • American Samoa
  • Andorra
  • Angola
  • Anguilla
  • Antarctica
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Armenia
  • Aruba
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bahrain
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bermuda
  • Bhutan
  • Bolivia
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Botswana
  • Brazil
  • British Indian Ocean Territory
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Brunei
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Cape Verde
  • Cayman Islands
  • Central African Republic
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • China
  • Christmas Island
  • Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
  • Colombia
  • Comoros
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cook Islands
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Cuba
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dhekelia
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • Easter Island
  • East Timor
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Falkland Islands
  • Faroe Islands
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • French Guiana
  • French Polynesia
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Greenland
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guam
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • Haiti
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • Hungary
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jersey
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kiribati
  • Kosovo
  • Kuwait
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Liechtenstein
  • Lithuania
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mali
  • Malta
  • Marshall Islands
  • Martinique
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mayotte
  • Mexico
  • Micronesia
  • Moldova
  • Monaco
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Montserrat
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Caledonia
  • New Zealand
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Niue
  • Norfolk Island
  • Northern Mariana Islands
  • North Korea
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Puerto Rico
  • Qatar
  • Réunion
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Helena
  • Saint Pierre And Miquelon
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • San Marino
  • São Tomé And Principe
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Sint Maarten
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
  • South Korea
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Suriname
  • Svalbard And Jan Mayen
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Taiwan
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tokelau
  • Tonga
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Turkmenistan
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • United States Virgin Islands
  • Uruguay
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vanuatu
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam
  • Wallis And Futuna
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 2015: Standard registration
  • 05 November 2019: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • OEF (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £40.00k £27.04k £15.00k
Total expenditure £24.60k £43.31k £25.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £40.00k £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 June 2019 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time