THE OCTOPUS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of other Charitable Organisations by grants and by volunteering activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
Governance
- 14 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Andrew Neil Sheppard | Chair | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emily Quilter | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Llewellyn | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Rogerson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369.82k | £350.64k | £264.78k | £420.77k | £288.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £443.28k | £146.73k | £402.00k | £489.72k | £286.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Apr 2015 as amended on 27 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; AND B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Octopus Giving
33 Holborn
EC1N 2HT
- Phone:
- 02077106489
- Email:
- GIVING@OCTOPUSGROUP.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window