Trustees BANBURY ANIMAL RESCUE AND KINDNESS SERVICE

Charity number: 1163343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN COLLINS Chair 01 January 2012
None on record
PATRICIA ANNE MCCOMBES Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
Alic Paget Trustee 11 March 2017
None on record
DAWN COLLEY Trustee 09 December 2013
None on record
MARIANNE CLAIRE KERN Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record
MARY DUNBAR Trustee
None on record