WAUN-FAWR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Waunfawr Community Hall and the adjacent two recreation areas of Maes Cartrefle and Maes Ceinion. Development, maintenance and repair of the above hall and adjacent areas Organisation of activities for the residents of Waunfawr.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,321 from 11321 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 10 November 1976: Standard registration
- WAUNFAWR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAI ALUN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Erfyl Roberts | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Duncan Tibbit | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Gwynfor James Williams | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.10k | £24.63k | £6.85k | £11.22k | £29.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.08k | £7.17k | £5.88k | £31.08k | £17.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.63k | N/A | N/A | £11.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2023 | 764 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1976, AS AMENDED 6 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WAUNFAWR AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WAUN-FAWR AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 Maesceinion
Waunfawr
ABERYSTWYTH
Dyfed
SY23 3QQ
- Phone:
- 01970624160
- Email:
- DAIALUN@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window