LITTLE OAKS CHILDREN'S CENTRE (WEST DURRINGTON)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Oaks Pre-School closed it doors in July 2016
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £34,694 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 March 2015: CIO registration
- 07 February 2017: Funds received from 1000432 WEST DURRINGTON PRE-SCHOOL PROJECT
- 26 July 2023: Funds transferred to
- 26 July 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- LITTLE OAKS CHILDREN?S CENTRE (WEST DURRINGTON) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.29k | £41.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.13k | £105.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £110.21k | £34.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG CHILDREN IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY BY:- 1. PROVIDING A PRESCHOOL SERVICE 2. PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT AND ENCOURAGING GOOD PARENTING SKILLS 3. PROVIDING WRAP AROUND CARE FOR CHILDREN UP TO THE END OF PRIMARY SCHOOL AGE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window