EQUINE PATHWAYS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Equine Pathways UK provides equine interactive sessions for children and adults, going through life changing and challenging situations. We off tailor made, individual and group sessions to our centre users, supporting people in need within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of York
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 11 March 2015: Standard registration
- EPUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Gee | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Eastwood | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY MEGSON | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.32k | £28.16k | £12.02k | £6.39k | £15.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.52k | £12.44k | £29.81k | £10.71k | £19.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £150 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 APR 2014 ADOPTED 07/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT / CARE OF SUCH PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL / PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS BY PROVIDING EQUINE ASSISTED THERAPY SESSIONS TO INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS THROUGH STRUCTURED WORKSHOPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
26 Bletchley Avenue
Horsforth
Leeds
LS18 4FA
- Phone:
- 01132897316
- Email:
- equinepathwaysuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window