Accounts and annual returns BOTANIC GARDENS SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity number: 505680
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 February 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2020 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required