ONE VISION MEDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One Vision , was established in March 2015. One Vision was started by a free speech group of people with disabilities 1998. The original group would meet one day per week to discuss ways in which they could voice their opinions and concerns about the services they would come into contact with on a regular basis. Choosing film as the medium gave everyone the opportunity to learn new skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,359,814
Donations and legacies | £7.86k | |
Charitable activities | £4.57k | |
Other trading activities | £1.35m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,210,168
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.05k | |
Other | £1.21m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,347,389 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.21m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.05k | |
Retained for future use | £149.65k |
People

41 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 17 March 2015: CIO registration
- ONE VISION MEDIA PRODUCTIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Jayne Knight | Chair | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Elizabeth Sweet | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
NAIOMI LOUISE HAMILTON | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Joseph W Malone | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ANN JEFFERS | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £518.51k | £615.78k | £751.30k | £987.58k | £1.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £512.41k | £593.99k | £715.07k | £873.78k | £1.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.35m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.50k | £12.12k | £5.88k | £4.32k | £7.86k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.35m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £131 | £93.01k | £23.87k | £0 | £4.57k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £510.87k | £510.65k | £721.55k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £512.41k | £593.99k | £715.07k | £873.78k | £4.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.48k | £0 | £0 | £35.07k | £4.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.21m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £103.38k | £12.60k | £8.40k | £250.11k | £334.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £20.56k | £126.80k | £128.36k | £57.77k | £124.23k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £0 | £12.60k | £8.40k | £106.82k | £107.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: * AN ALTERNATIVE COMMUNITY BASED TRAINING AND ACTIVITIES PROGRAMME IN FILM AND MEDIA EDUCATION. * A PERSON CENTRED, NEEDS LED APPROACH TO LEARNING AND SUPPORT THAT WILL ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO MAKE INFORMED CHOICES ABOUT THEMSELVES AND THEIR EDUCATION. * A SERVICE THAT WILL WORK WITH OTHER LOCAL GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE COMMUNITY COHESION. * A SERVICE THAT WILL RAISE AWARENESS OF DISABILITY ARTS IN THE WIGAN BOROUGH THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN EVENTS AND LOCAL ARTS AND DISABILITY ARTS FESTIVALS. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: * ALTERNATIVE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES THAT ADDRESSES A SHORTFALL IN MAINSTREAM SERVICES. * A PERSON CENTRED SERVICE THAT WILL LOOK TO IMPROVE WELLBEING, PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Tenter Drive
Standish
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN6 0BN
- Phone:
- 01942211000
- Email:
- team@onevisionmedia.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window