BEYOND THE PALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and celebration of rural heritages through the production , promotion and presentation of any form of media for the benefit of the community especially in rural areas. The initial project examines the hop growing and processing industry in West Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 28 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN OLIVER BA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN HURST-BROWN B.SC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE SANDRA OUTRAM B.SC.HONS; M.SC. | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF RURAL INDUSTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BARN
Sandhurst Farm
Clayhill Road
Lamberhurst
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN3 8AX
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- Jo@beyondthepale.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window