THINK PACIFIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplying educational resources and developing early years education provision, sports and extra-curricular activities in rural schools in Fiji. Supporting communities impacted by Tropical Cyclone Winston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Fiji
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON DARKER | Chair | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL PHILIP SCOTT | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JOSEPH WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HARRY WILSON HUNTER | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.27k | £49.65k | £8.30k | £4.49k | £10.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.32k | £57.90k | £34.07k | £311 | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE FIJI ISLANDS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT, EXTRA-CURRICULAR ADVANCEMENT, SPORTS DEVELOPMENT, TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES, IMPROVED INFRASTRUCTURE, IMPROVED ACCESS TO HEALTHCARE AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO LIVE HEALTHY LIVES, IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING, GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knowledge Exchange
148 The Rose Bowl
Portland Crescent
LEEDS
LS1 3HB
- Phone:
- 07595437797
- Email:
- simon@thinkpacific.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window