HAM INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to promote for the benefit of Ham within the London Borough of Richmond and the Royal Borough of Kingston Upon Thames and surrounding areas an effort of advanced education, social welfare and recreation. Also to offer space and facilities of a community centre and to manage & maintain in cooperation with local authorities to achieve these objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 23 November 2016: Standard registration
- 15 October 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1143951 VINEYARD COMMUNITY CENTRE
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 303813 HAM SCOUT GROUP
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1177033 THE BASEMENT DOOR
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1136675 HAM AND PETERSHAM SOS
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 303819 THE PETERSHAM AND HAM SEA SCOUT GROUP
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 306016 THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.54k | £63.05k | £27.09k | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.80k | £87.06k | £52.70k | £383.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 91 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 08 October 2020 | 466 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 29 September 2020 | 457 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2016
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF HAM WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (II) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF HAM WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window