LUKE'S LIFE LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide families of children with brain tumours accommodation when travelling to any hospital within the Northumberland and Tyne and Wear Foundation Trust from out of the local area. To provide for the development of research into practical applications for the prevention, treatment and cure of children's' brain cancer, particularly low grade gliomas. Fundraising in NE of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 2015: Standard registration
- LLL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA JANE COLLINS | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN COLLINS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £1.03k | £5.28k | £2.94k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £702 | £226 | £1.36k | £218 | £486 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2015 as amended on 24 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN SUFFERING WITH BRAIN TUMOURS, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON LOW-GRADE GLIOMAS (LGGS), BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN WITH ACCOMMODATION WHEN TRAVELLING TO ANY HOSPITAL WITHIN 'THE NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE AND WEAR FOUNDATION TRUST' FROM OUT OF THE LOCAL AREA. 2. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF RESPITE HOLIDAYS OR SHORT BREAKS FOR FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN. 3.PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF RESEARCH INTO PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS FOR THE PREVENTION,TREATMENT AND CURE OF CHILDRENS BRAIN CANCER, PARTICULARLY LOW-GRADE GLIOMAS (LGGS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HOWARD CLOSE
HOLYSTONE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE27 0UU
- Phone:
- 07709349995
- Email:
- Lukeslifelegacy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window