WARWICKSHIRE PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of equality and diversity by eliminating discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation and gender identity, primarily for persons up to the age of 25 years. Providing support for such young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 June 2015: CIO registration
- PUSH PROJECTS (Working name)
- PUSH PROJECTS LGBTQ YOUTH SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL BROWNE | Chair | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen White | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David de Sousa | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Guest | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lord Clifford Hume | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Davies | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
HEALEY MOYES | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.53k | £18.56k | £49.41k | £84.52k | £166.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.71k | £7.30k | £30.15k | £82.17k | £100.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.55k | £21.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 JUN 2015 AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 26 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDER AND QUESTIONING (LGBTQ) YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH A) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT B) SAFE SOCIAL MEETING SPACES WHERE PEOPLE CAN EXPLORE VERBALLY AND EXPRESS THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY. 2. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN WARWICKSHIRE AREA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY. B) WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS PROVIDERS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF LGBT ISSUES AND THE NEEDS OF LGBT YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS. C) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, WITH A FOCUS ON SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 SPINNEY HILL
WARWICK
CV34 5SP
- Phone:
- 07816181428
- Email:
- info@warwickshirepride.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window