Financial history BIDEFORD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1159942
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.11k £6.48k £6.83k £12.50k £14.43k
Total expenditure £9.93k £3.64k £3.98k £6.20k £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £500