Vineyard Global Council Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian faith, promotion of the overall vision of the international family of Vineyard Churches, communication between the Vineyard family to enable it to provide assistance to the wider Christian church and releasing of new Association of Vineyard Churches worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 29 September 2015: Standard registration
- VIR (Working name)
- VINEYARD INTERNATIONAL RESOURCING UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudio Osvaldo Caro Caro | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Mumford | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER FORBES MELVILLE STURROCK | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM JOSEPH QUIRKE | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.76k | £129.05k | £135.17k | £172.52k | £231.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.83k | £192.03k | £149.31k | £230.18k | £221.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 NOV 2014 as amended on 16 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION’S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE THROUGH: - PROMOTING THE OVERALL VISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL FAMILY OF VINEYARD CHURCHES TO FULFIL THE GREAT COMMISSION OF JESUS CHRIST GIVEN TO HIS DISCIPLES RECORDED IN THE SCRIPTURES TO GO AND MAKE DISCIPLES OF ALL NATIONS, BAPTISING THEM IN THE NAME OF THE FATHER AND OF THE SON AND OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, AND TEACHING THEM TO OBEY EVERYTHING THAT OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST COMMANDED THEM TO DO; - STRENGTHENING COMMUNICATION WITHIN THE VINEYARD FAMILY IN ORDER THAT IT MAY WORK HARMONIOUSLY ACROSS THE WORLD AND TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH; - RAISING AWARENESS OF MISSIONS ISSUES AND ESTABLISH INTERNATIONAL WORKING GROUPS/TASK FORCES, AS AND WHEN APPROPRIATE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCHING, DEVELOPING AND IMPLEMENTING ISSUES OF INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION; - FACILITATING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF RECOMMENDED GUIDELINES RELATING TO NATIONS IN WHICH THE VINEYARD FAMILY IS EMERGING; - PROVIDING RECOMMENDED GUIDELINES BASED ON OUR SHARED AND COMMON VALUES, FOR THE RELEASE OF NEW ASSOCIATIONS OF VINEYARD CHURCHES, CONFLICT RESOLUTION BETWEEN AND AMONGST THOSE ASSOCIATIONS, AND THE USE OF THE VINEYARD NAME; - BEING AVAILABLE TO ARBITRATE AND PROVIDE A FINAL ‘COURT OF APPEAL’ FOR NATIONAL LEADERS AND NATIONAL ASSOCIATIONS OF VINEYARD CHURCHES, UPON REQUEST BY EITHER THE NATIONAL LEADER OR THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; - OFFERING RESOURCES TO NEW NATIONAL LEADERS AND NEW NATIONAL MOVEMENTS OF VINEYARD CHURCHES; - HELPING WITH SUCCESSION PLANNING; - PROVIDING CRISIS MANAGEMENT AND CONFLICT RESOLUTION, AS AND WHEN NEEDED; - FACILITATING THE COORDINATION OF TRADEMARKING, WHERE APPROPRIATE; - CO-ORDINATING NATIONAL LEADERS’ MEETINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8
K3 Business Park
200 Clough Road
Hull
HU5 1SW
- Phone:
- 01482 462690
- Email:
- finance.legal@vcuki.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window