THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through our brand, 'Christians in Media' our activities 'support, encourage and inspire' Christians who work in, and with, media. They include: a) Mentoring Programme for Young Christians, b) Christians in Media Online Service, c) Annual Day of Prayer for the Media, d) Regional Gatherings, e) Bi-Monthly Lunchtime Prayer Meetings f) Regular blogs g) Stories, f) Special Workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 July 2015: CIO registration
- 10 March 2020: Funds received from 297766 THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK
- Christians in Media (Working name)
- CMN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcia Muller | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Miosi | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toluwani Samuel Adebekun | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sun-Schuster | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Craig David Forrest | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lani Christine Charlwood | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josie Hannah Gamble | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Justine Chapman | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.05k | £113.73k | £2.16k | £21.24k | £3.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.29k | £2.51k | £26.43k | £27.96k | £23.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE BROADCAST, ELECTRONIC AND PRINT MEDIA IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07557097941
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window