HOWE CROFT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a charity that provides space to hire for the local authorities and general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 01 June 2015: CIO registration
- HCCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Croft | Chair | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Ceo | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.00k | £27.55k | £28.05k | £25.40k | £27.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.00k | £19.16k | £22.82k | £33.70k | £29.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £17.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2025 | 709 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2025 | 709 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 May 2023 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 May 2023 | 377 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2022 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2022 | 383 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
(1)PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (2)ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; (3)PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.THE AREA OF BENEFIT("AREA OF BENEFIT")SHALL BE NORTH BOURNEMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Turnbull Lane
Bournemouth
Dorset
BH11 9BG
- Phone:
- 01202940949
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window