Financial history SALISBURY SPIRITUALIST MEETING HOUSE

Charity number: 1159959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.00k £9.01k £6.14k £7.62k £7.23k
Total expenditure £8.85k £11.82k £7.50k £12.12k £10.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A