Financial history BIRMINGHAM EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1165709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.48m £2.41m £2.88m £2.81m £3.02m
Total expenditure £2.55m £2.24m £2.53m £3.06m £3.51m
Income from government contracts £1.43m £1.08m £1.25m £1.08m £1.50m
Income from government grants N/A £953.82k £898.57k £824.19k £385.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.20k £2.50k £2.21k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.47m £2.41m £2.88m £2.81m £2.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.24k £1.06k £374 £8.78k £26.57k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.55m £2.24m £2.53m £3.06m £3.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.28k £18.80k £7.38k £25.57k £18.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £7.50k £28.28k £96.10k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0