THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF THOUGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance education for the benefit of the public by promoting on a non-political basis the study and discussion of and the exchange and dissemination of information and knowledge concerning the educational and social effects and influences of existing educational systems and other aspects of public policy, in each case whether in the United Kingdom or elsewhere in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
Governance
- 21 May 2015: CIO registration
- OST (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CANSELL | Chair | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Philip Marples | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
XANDER CANSELL | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £167 | £4.33k | £230 | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF THOUGHT ARE: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL EFFECTS OF EXISTING EDUCATIONAL SYSTEMS AND PUBLIC POLICY ON EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE BY PROMOTING ON A NON-POLITICAL BASIS RESEARCH AND DISCUSSION OF THE SAME AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 High Street
Wheatley
OXFORD
OX33 1XX
- Phone:
- 01865421135
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window