Financial history THE MANOR GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1166836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.46k £4.82k £13.81k £9.25k £11.98k
Total expenditure £10.74k £9.67k £15.92k £14.28k £16.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A