JAAGO FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JAAGO Foundation UK works to support the prevention and relief of poverty in Bangladesh for the benefit of the public, by providing assistance for the educational needs of children from socially and economically disadvantaged backgrounds, supporting access to medical advice and nutritious meals, and assisting access to employment opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Hertfordshire
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 21 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH DONACHIE | Chair | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KORVI RAKSHAND DHRUBO | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACK PUNTER | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEX DURHAM | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
RUKMINAJ MORRIS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.86k | £224.75k | £131.87k | £239.52k | £178.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.36k | £197.27k | £2.29k | £302.88k | £383.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BANGLADESH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE FOR THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, SUPPORTING ACCESS TO MEDICAL ADVICE AND NUTRITIOUS MEALS, AND ASSISTING ACCESS TO EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Brook View
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG4 9NY
- Phone:
- 07872628041
- Email:
- Jaagouk@jaago.com.bd
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window