WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Wild at Heart Foundation is to compassionately reduce the world's stray dog population through sponsoring sterilisation and welfare campaigns globally. Wild at Heart Foundation also supports awareness and education campaigns, helping project partners to encourage their local communities to change attitudes and behaviours towards dogs, and to treat them with kindness and respect.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Greece
- India
- Mexico
- Romania
- South Africa
- Ukraine
Governance
- 15 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marisha Dhawan | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Cane | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Louise Richmond | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stephanie Schilling Camu | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIKKI TIBBLES | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £514.20k | £527.51k | £523.34k | £310.39k | £189.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £377.57k | £673.08k | £521.36k | £282.43k | £182.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £25.85k | £556.85k | £523.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.00k | £14.33k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £458.99k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.35k | £1.33k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £377.57k | £673.08k | £521.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.75k | £53.91k | £69.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 October 2023 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 October 2023 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 May 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF HUMANITY IN GENERAL, THE WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION EXISTS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE AND PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS AND THE RELIEF OF THEIR SUFFERING. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OUR FOCUS IS TO HUMANELY AND COMPASSIONATELY REDUCE THE WORLD?S 600 MILLION STRAY DOG POPULATION. WE DO THIS BY PROVIDING FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO: (1) RESCUE AND ADOPTION PROJECTS; (2) NEUTERING PROGRAMMES (INCL. RESEARCH INTO NEW STERILIZATION TECHNIQUES); AND (3) EDUCATION AND AWARENESS INITIATIVES THAT PERTAIN TO ANIMAL WELFARE, IN PARTICULAR THE IMPORTANCE OF NEUTERING, THE VALUE OF OWNING RESCUE RATHER THAN ?PUPPY-FARMED? DOGS, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wild at Heart Foundation
52 Linford Street
London
SW8 4UN
- Phone:
- 02072291174
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window