Financial history PAVILIONS TEIGNMOUTH

Charity number: 1162175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £438.00k £260.44k £393.64k £453.92k £526.80k
Total expenditure £417.60k £239.85k £422.95k £460.00k £520.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £86.97k £8.31k £316 £500
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.91k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £491.89k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £300.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £219.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £38.20k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0