BLAISE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration of existing greenhouses Planting, growing and harvesting plants, vegetables and fruit on a cooperative basis. Encouraging and training volunteers in good horticultural practice. Running regular monthly open days over the late Spring, Summer and early Autumn periods. Sharing produce with the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 09 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Sansom | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Shanahan | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lissy Porter | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Valerie Skelding | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Aimee-Rose New | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Rosser | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rosser | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Greg Ashdown-Hoare | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Marrs | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Christine Brown | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR KENNETH RICHMOND BLACKWELL | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Kim Ashdown-Hoare | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.16k | £4.61k | £13.90k | £13.93k | £11.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £16.09k | £12.57k | £18.39k | £6.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN HENBURY, BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT HORTICULTURE IN AND AROUND THE COMMUNITY GARDEN. 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE GARDEN BY RESTORING DERELICT AREAS AND PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
183 SHIREHAMPTON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS9 2EQ
- Phone:
- 07854714085
- Website:
-
blaisecommunitygarden.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window