Accounts and annual returns NESS GARDENS - (AGNES LOIS BULLEY TRUST)

Charity Number: 505721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window