NESS GARDENS - (AGNES LOIS BULLEY TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist with the maintenance upkeep of Ness Gardens
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 November 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.33k | £166.56k | £153.70k | £345.21k | £343.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.85k | £198.53k | £187.35k | £374.07k | £380.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1948 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 23 SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE OF THE GARDENS AS A PUBLIC PARK AND FLOWER GARDEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUNDATION BUILDING
765 BROWNLOW HILL
LIVERPOOL
L69 7ZX
- Phone:
- 01517942107
- Website:
-
nessgardens.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window