GWELFOR COMMUNITY CONCERN URBAN AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre.To promote the benefit of all inhabitants of Morawelon - London Road area and neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of, religious or other opinions by associating the local L.A., voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare and recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,135 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 19 November 1976: Standard registration
- GWELFOR COMMUNITY CONCERN (Working name)
- COMMUNITY CONCERN, HOLYHEAD (Previous name)
- GWELFOR COMMUNITY CONCERN, HOLYHEAD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eifiona Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA ANN HUBAND | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
NORAH DUNNE | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ROBERTS | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN WILLIAM HUBAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.90k | £50.29k | £29.42k | £28.15k | £54.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.09k | £19.78k | £29.01k | £50.14k | £32.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.60k | £8.00k | £19.57k | N/A | £12.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 AUGUST 2007 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MORAWELON - LONDON ROAD AREA OF HOLYHEAD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, AGE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF HEALTH, SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE MORAWELON/LONDON ROAD AREA OF HOLYHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GWELFOR COMMUNITY CENTRE
FFORDD TUDUR
HOLYHEAD
ANGLESEY
LL65 2DH
- Phone:
- 01407763559
- Email:
- gcc.2@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window