ST WINEFRIDES PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sessional Playgroup for children aged 21/2 - 5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 30 November 1976: Standard registration
- ST WINIFRIDE'S PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Wardle | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Nudd | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Hodgkin | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Hammond | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.62k | £178.36k | £115.91k | £135.56k | £120.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.47k | £108.99k | £141.55k | £125.86k | £134.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £81.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE PLAYGROUP SHALL BE TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN FROM 3 TO 5 YEARS OLD.
Area of benefit
SHEPSHED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Winifrides Play School
43 Garendon Road
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 9NU
- Phone:
- 01509601266
- Email:
- stwinnies@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window