HOME-START BRACKNELL FOREST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting families with Children between the ages of 0 and 5 in the Bracknell Forest Area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,334 from 2 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 11 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Gunner | Chair | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MOONEY | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Ziegler | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kamyar Missaghi | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Wallace | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gbadebo | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||
HILARY MASON | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.24k | £132.06k | £95.77k | £118.20k | £145.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.12k | £91.33k | £103.35k | £127.81k | £145.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £44.33k | £44.34k | £44.34k | N/A | £74.33k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.90k | £5.65k | £7.20k | £74.33k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF SOUTH EAST BERKSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OPEN LEARNING CENTRE
RECTORY LANE
BRACKNELL
RG12 7GR
- Phone:
- 01344860025
- Email:
- office@hsbf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window