LLANELLI AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provides a fortnightly talking newspaper service to approximately 250 blind and visually handicapped persons, the majority of whom reside in the Llanelli and District area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 November 1976: Standard registration
- 06 August 2024: Funds received from 1049001 AMMANFORD TALKING NEWSPAPERS
- LLANELLI TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT IAN LLOYD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE JOHN | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE JOHN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IORWERTH THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANN LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84k | £1.55k | £1.60k | £15.10k | £10.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £2.88k | £2.18k | £3.15k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 250 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 250 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 616 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 616 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 981 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 981 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PEPARE, PRODUCE AND DISTRIBUTE IN LLANELLI AND DISTRICT A NEWSPAPER RECORDED ON TAPEFOR THE USE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND OTHERS SUFFERING FROM A PHYSICAL HANDICAP WHICH MAKES NORMAL READING DIFFICULT OR IMPOSSIBLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 (A-E) OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
LLANELLI AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 COLESHILL TERRACE
LLANELLI
SA15 3BT
- Phone:
- 01554772350
- Email:
- jcwilliams70@mac.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window