MELYN UNITED BOWLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an out door bowls club located at Burnside Park Neath. The green is open to the members from the beginning of April through to the end of September. We provide free coaching and equipment to non members who want to try the game of Bowls We also liaise with two local junior school providing two weekly taster sessions over a six week period during the months of June and July
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £350 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 15 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Woodley | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Williams | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Doug Hardie | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Price | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD PARTIN | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hughes | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.34k | £1.23k | £2.91k | £3.25k | £2.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £4.68k | £3.21k | £4.74k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £100 | £200 | £200 | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MELYN AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 Greenwood Drive
Cimla
Neath
SA11 2BW
- Phone:
- 01639790944
- Email:
- howard.partin@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window